Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649709 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2015069022 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013186726 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5850894B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2016 | B2 | JP2015051492 | 19.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013186726 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104416246B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2018 | B | CN104416246 | 18.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013186726 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2845677 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2018 | B1 | EP2845677 | 20.05.2015 | A3 | EP2845677 | 11.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013186726 | 09.09.2013 |