EP2851110 - Filter element and filter system with a filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Hindenburgstr. 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruhland, Klaus-Dieter Eichengasse 26 67149 Meckenheim / DE | 02 /
Kaufmann, Michael Grossgasse 13 67149 Meckenheim / DE | [2015/13] | Application number, filing date | 14182363.3 | 27.08.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | DE20131014490 | 02.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013014490 | [2015/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851110 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/00, B01D46/24, B01D46/52 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
B01D46/0046 (EP,US);
F02M35/02416 (US);
B01D46/0004 (US);
B01D46/2414 (EP,US);
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Filterelement und Filtersystem mit einem Filterelement | [2015/13] | English: | Filter element and filter system with a filter element | [2015/13] | French: | Élément de filtre et système de filtre équipé d'un élément de filtre | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE202009016500U (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0025] - [0028]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE202008015438U (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] - [0028] *; | [X]WO2011146474 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * abstract *; | [X]EP2535550 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0007] * | by applicant | DE202009016500U |