EP2842743 - Relief printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and relief printing plate and process for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishi-Azabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuhara, Yuichi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 14182808.7 | 29.08.2014 | [2015/10] | Priority number, date | JP20130180174 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013180174 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842743 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2842743 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/05, B41N1/12 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B23K26/361 (EP,US);
B41C1/05 (EP,US);
B41N1/12 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
B23K2103/42 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
B41C2210/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L101/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L11/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L15/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L29/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L31/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L35/08 (EP,US);
C08K3/04, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L67/04, C08K3/04, C08L75/02 (US);
C08K3/04, C08L7/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L75/02 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L75/08 (US);
C08K3/04, C08L75/14 (US);
C08K3/04, C08L75/14, C08K3/04, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L77/00 (US,EP);
C08K3/04, C08L9/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Reliefdruckplattenvorläufer für Lasergravierung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Reliefdruckplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2015/10] | English: | Relief printing plate precursor for laser engraving and process for producing same, and relief printing plate and process for making same | [2015/10] | French: | Précurseur de plaque d'impression en relief pour gravure au laser, son procédé de fabrication, plaque d'impression en relief et procédé de fabrication associé | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 03.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2014 | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | IE | 29.08.2016 | LU | 29.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | FR | 27.09.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
FR | 27.09.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005115920 (HILLER MARGIT [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0035] * * paragraph [0047]; table 1 * * examples 1, B; claims 1-9 *; | [A]JP2009262370 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-17 * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] *; | [A]JP2010247368 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-7 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] * * paragraph [0080] * | by applicant | JP2010042657 | JPH0529648B | JP2013011827 | JPS4627926B | JPS5147334B | JPS57196231 | JPS595240 | JPS595241 | JPH02226149 | JPH01165613 | JPS5421726B | JPS4841708B | JPS5137193 | JPH0232293B | JPH0216765B | JPS5849860B | JPS5617654B | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | JPS63277653 | JPS63260909 | JPH01105238 | JPS4864183 | JPS4943191B | JPS5230490B | JPS4643946B | JPH0140337B | JPH0140336B | JPH0225493 | JPS6122048 | JP2009204962 | JP2008063554 | JP2011245818 | JP2009172658 | JP2009214334 | - Handbook of Carbon Black (third edition), CARBON BLACK ASSOCIATION, (1995), page 184 | - JOURNAL OF THE ADHESION SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1984), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 300 - 308 | - Kobunshi Daijiten, MARUZEN CO., LTD., (1994), pages 211 - 220 | - UNKNOWN, Laser Handbook 2nd Edition', THE LASER SOCIETY OF JAPAN, | - UNKNOWN, 'Applied Laser Technology', THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, |