EP2846506 - FBMC RECEIVER WITH CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/11] | FBMC receiver with carrier frequency offset compensation | ||
[2015/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dore, Jean-Baptiste 5 rue du 26 mai 1944 38950 Saint Martin le Vinoux / FR | 02 /
Cassiau, Nicolas 711 chemin de la Burletière 38960 Saint Etienne de Crossey / FR | [2016/14] |
Former [2015/11] | 01 /
Dore, Jean-Baptiste 5 rue du 26 mai 1944 38950 Saint Martin le Vinoux / FR | ||
02 /
Cassiau, Nicolas 163 chemin de l'Arny 38960 Saint Etienne de Crossey / FR | Representative(s) | Brevalex 56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 14183366.5 | 03.09.2014 | [2015/11] | Priority number, date | FR20130058446 | 04.09.2013 Original published format: FR 1358446 | [2015/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846506 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2846506 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
H04L27/2657 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (US);
H04L27/2601 (US);
H04L27/2654 (EP,US);
H04L27/26416 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/11] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2015/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FBMC-EMPFÄNGER MIT OFFSETKOMPENSATION DER TRÄGERFREQUENZ | [2015/51] | English: | FBMC RECEIVER WITH CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET COMPENSATION | [2015/51] | French: | RÉCEPTEUR FBMC À COMPENSATION D'OFFSET DE FRÉQUENCE PORTEUSE | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/11] | FBMC-Empfänger mit Offsetkompensation der Trägerfrequenz | ||
Former [2015/11] | FBMC receiver with carrier frequency offset compensation | ||
Former [2015/11] | Récepteur FBMC à compensation d'offset de fréquence porteuse | Examination procedure | 10.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 19.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2014 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | ES | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | IT | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | MT | 06.04.2016 | NL | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | IE | 03.09.2016 | LU | 03.09.2016 | BE | 30.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 03.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
TR | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 03.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 03.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 03.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
MT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.09.2014 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
LU | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 03.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
IT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
ES | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 06.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - STITZ T H ET AL, "CFO estimation and correction in a WiMAX-like FBMC system", SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, 2009. SPAWC '09. IEEE 10TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090621), ISBN 978-1-4244-3695-8, pages 633 - 637, XP031487904 [A] 1-15 * page 635; figure 1b * | [A] - QING BAI ET AL, "On the effects of carrier frequency offset on cyclic prefix based OFDM and filter bank based multicarrier systems", SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS (SPAWC), 2010 IEEE ELEVENTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100620), ISBN 978-1-4244-6990-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031837458 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - FRANK SCHAICH, "Filterbank based multi carrier transmission (FBMC) â evolving OFDM: FBMC in the context of WiMAX", WIRELESS CONFERENCE (EW), 2010 EUROPEAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100412), ISBN 978-1-4244-5999-5, pages 1051 - 1058, XP031688571 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | - B. HIROSAKI, "An orthogonally multiplexed QAM system using the discrete Fourier transform", IEEE TRANS ON COMM., (198107), vol. 29, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/TCOM.1981.1095093, pages 982 - 989, XP000568062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1981.1095093 | - P. SIOHAN ET AL., "Analysis and design of OFDM/OQAM systems based on filterbank theory", IEEE TRANS. ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (200205), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 1170 - 1183 | - M. BELLANGER ET AL., FBMC PHYSICAL LAYER : A PRIMER, URL: www.ict-phydyas.org | - T.H. STITZ ET AL., "CFO estimation and correction in a Wi-MAX-like FBMC system", SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, 2009, SPAWC '09, pages 633 - 637 |