EP2835975 - Image encoding device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 c/o Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2015/33] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadono, Shinya c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Abe, Kiyofumi c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Center Planning and Management Group 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/07] | Application number, filing date | 14183528.0 | 22.09.2003 | [2015/07] | Priority number, date | JP20020289303 | 01.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002289303 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2835975 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2835975 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/176, H04N19/70, H04N19/196, H04N19/112, H04N19/16 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
H04N19/16 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/112 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (KR);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/07] | Title | German: | Bildcodierungseinrichtung und -verfahren | [2015/07] | English: | Image encoding device and method | [2015/07] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de codage d'images | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 01.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 10.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03799117.1 / EP1549077 | EP10165422.6 / EP2239949 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PANUSOPONE K ET AL, "Multi-frame interpolative prediction in AFF", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG AND ITU-T VCEG, 4TH MEETING: KLAGENFURT, AUSTRIA, 22-26 JULY 2002, (20020726), no. JVT-D090, XP030005364 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - LIMIN WANG ET AL, "MB-Level Adaptive Frame/Field Coding for JVT", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), (20020201), no. JVT-B106, XP030005103 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - "TEXT OF COMMITTEE DRAFT OF JOINT VIDEO SPECIFICATION (ITU-T REC. H-264 ISO/IEC 14496-10 AVC) MPEG02/N4810", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 MPEG02/N4810, FAIRFAX, US, (200205), pages I - X,1, XP001074690 [A] 1,2 * pages 6-7, paragraph 6.1 * * page 16, paragraph 7.3.7 * * Table 8-6; page 33, paragraph 8.2.6 - paragraph 8.2.6.3 * * Figure 11-2; pages 100-107, paragraph 11 - paragraph 11.5.2 * | [A] - "Text of ISO/IEC 14496-10 FCD Advanced Video Coding", 61. MPEG MEETING;22-07-2002 - 26-07-2002; KLAGENFURT; (MOTION PICTUREEXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), (20020811), no. N4920, ISSN 0000-0365, XP030012343 [A] 1,2 * pages 7-8, paragraph 6.1 * * pages 15-17, paragraph 7.3.2.1 - paragraph 7.3.2.2 * * pages 20-23, paragraph 7.3.3 - paragraph 7.3.3.3 * * page 60, paragraph 8.3.6.9 * * pages 32-49, paragraph 7.4.2.1 - paragraph 7.4.5.3.2 * * pages 112-121, paragraph 10 - paragraph 10.4.3 * | [A] - KIKUCHI Y ET AL, "Improved multiple frame motion compensation using frame interpolation", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), (20020129), no. JVT-B075, pages 1 - 5, XP002340658 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - YOSHIHIOR K ET AL, "Multi-frame interpolative prediction with modified syntax", JOINT VIDEO TEAM (JVT) OF ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG (ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), 3RD MEETING: FAIRFAX, VIRGINIA, USA, DOCUMENT JVT-C066, (20020306), XP002461012 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |