EP2848759 - Dampening device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co. KG Industriezentrum 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSTES, Dirk Brökerstr. 8 33602 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
FELD, Steffen Auf der Howe 42 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 03 /
BÖWE, Marion Arndtstr. 6 33803 Steinhagen / DE | 04 /
WALHORN, Oliver Schloßstr. 30 33824 Werther / DE | 05 /
TREIBER, André Hermannstr. 10 33824 Werther / DE | 06 /
WEBER, Klaus Schloßhofstr. 5 33615 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/12] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183628.8 | 04.09.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | DE201310110111 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013110111 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848759 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2848759 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/10 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
E05F5/10 (EP);
E05F5/003 (EP);
E05Y2800/205 (EP);
E05Y2800/21 (EP);
E05Y2800/244 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Dämpfungsvorrichtung | [2015/12] | English: | Dampening device | [2015/12] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 20.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2014 | AL | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | MT | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.09.2014 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.09.2014 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 08.11.2017 | |
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102007059575 (RENNERICH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12,15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0031] - [0037] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 5,6; | [YD]DE102009034740 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 13,14 * paragraph [0048]; figure 8 *; | [AD]DE102008051360 (SIMON KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1,15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033] * * figures 1,5 * | by applicant | DE102009034740 | DE102008051360 |