EP2840457 - SECONDARY SEAT FOR GAS REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/09] | Secondary seat for gas regulator | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC K-Annex, 8100 West Florissant Avenue St. Louis, MO 63136 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quijano, Eric M. 1605 Morning Dove Aubrey, TX 76227 / US | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/09] | 01 /
Quijano, Eric M. 1605 Morning Dove Aubrey, TX Texas 76227 / US | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/09] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183674.2 | 18.04.2008 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | US20070913121P | 20.04.2007 Original published format: US 913121 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840457 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2840457 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/06, F16K1/36, F16K1/44, F16K25/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
F16K1/422 (EP,US);
F16K1/443 (EP,US);
F16K25/00 (EP,US);
G05D16/0688 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7764 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7793 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2015/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRSITZ FÜR EINEN GASREGULATOR | [2016/11] | English: | SECONDARY SEAT FOR GAS REGULATOR | [2016/11] | French: | SIÈGE SECONDAIRE POUR RÉGULATEUR DE GAZ | [2016/11] |
Former [2015/09] | Sekundärsitz für einen Gasregulator | ||
Former [2015/09] | Secondary seat for gas regulator | ||
Former [2015/09] | Siège secondaire pour régulateur de gaz | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 16.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08746296.6 / EP2140327 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2008 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 18.04.2017 | LU | 18.04.2017 | MT | 18.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.04.2008 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.04.2008 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
MT | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 18.04.2017 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 18.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4176677 (HUGHES GEORGE C [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3754570 (HUGHES G) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4067355 (ST CLAIR THEODORE A) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2024996 (SINGER CO) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29506395U (RHEINAUER MASCH ARMATUREN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |