Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10172554 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B2 | US2015065842 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130106380 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101536139B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2015 | B1 | KR20150027947 | 13.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130106380 | 05.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2845538 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B8 | EP2845538 | 13.11.2019 | B1 | EP2845538 | 11.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130106380 | 05.09.2013 |