EP2821606 - Method for reducing nitrogen oxides, carbon monoxide and hydrocarbons in exhausts of internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecogen, Inc. 45 First Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Tecogen, Inc. 45 First Aveune Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Tecogen, Inc. 45 First Aveune Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panora, Robert A. 58 Clifton Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02140 / US | 02 /
Roser, Ranson 1759 Terrace Heights Lane Reno, NV Nevada 89523 / US | 03 /
Gehret, Joseph B. 193 Elm Street Unit 224 North Reading, MA 01864 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2015/02] | 01 /
Panora, Robert A. 58 Clifton Street Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02140 / US | ||
02 /
Roser, Ranson 1759 Terrace Heights Lane Reno, NV Nevada 89523 / US | |||
03 /
Gehret, Joseph B. 51 Homestead Road Lynnfield, MA Massachusetts 01940 / US | Representative(s) | Russell, Tim Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/42] |
Former [2015/02] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183871.4 | 17.06.2010 | [2015/02] | Priority number, date | US20100816706 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: US 816706 | US201034339210P | 28.04.2010 Original published format: US 34339210 P | [2018/42] |
Former [2015/02] | US20100816706 | 16.06.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821606 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821606 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/05, B01D53/94, F01N3/20, F01N13/00 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
F01N3/05 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01D53/9495 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0205 (EP,US);
F01N3/04 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (EP,US);
F01N3/2046 (EP,US);
F01N5/025 (EP,US);
B01D2258/014 (EP,US);
F01N2240/36 (EP,US);
F01N2260/022 (EP);
F01N2260/024 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion von Stickstoffoxiden, Kohlenmonoxid und Kohlenwasserstoffen in Abgasen von Verbrennungsmotoren | [2015/02] | English: | Method for reducing nitrogen oxides, carbon monoxide and hydrocarbons in exhausts of internal combustion engines | [2015/02] | French: | Procédé de réduction d'oxydes d'azote, de monoxyde de carbone et d'hydrocarbures dans les échappements de moteurs à combustion interne | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10166307.8 / EP2397216 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2010 | AL | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | IE | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LU | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | ES | 18.06.2020 | SE | 18.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | DK | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | NO | 30.06.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MK | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 18.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 18.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 18.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
DK | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NO | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 16.10.2019 | |
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 16.10.2019 | |
BG | 16.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3662540 (MURPHEY RICHARD C) [A] 1; | [A]US3757521 (TOURTELLOTTE J, et al) [A] 1; | [A]US2004206069 (TUMATI PRASAD [US], et al) [A] 1; | [A]US6178744 (PERSET DENIS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | US5603215 |