Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2829500 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2829500



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 343
12.04.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.06.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.02.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
09.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
17.12.2015 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 37
30.10.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 11
17.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
17.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.03.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
25.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 5
13.02.2015 European search report Search / examination 4
11.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
14.01.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Partial European search report Search / examination 5
27.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 13
31.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
08.09.2014 Description Search / examination 21
08.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Drawings Search / examination 14
08.09.2014 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
08.09.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
07.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
16.09.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
25.06.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33