02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
15.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
22.12.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
17.02.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
13.01.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.08.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
29.07.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
30.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
First examination report |
|
07.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
13.02.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
12.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|