Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10668616 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2020 | B2 | US2017348852 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715682178 | 21.08.2017 | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2848375 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2023 | B1 | EP2848375 | 18.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12178833 | 01.08.2012 | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9764464 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2013031764 | 07.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6068863B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2017 | B2 | JP2013035120 | 21.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2554337 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2014 | B1 | EP2554337 | 06.11.2013 | A3 | EP2554337 | 06.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102909723B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2019 | B | CN102909723 | 06.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2782986 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | C | CA2782986 | 03.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2523827T | 01.12.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201113197757 | 03.08.2011 | Type | Earlier application | EP2554337 |