EP2824929 - Quantization based on rate-distortion modeling for cabac coders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karczewicz, Marta c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
Ye, Yan c/o Qualcomm Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Wimmer, Hubert WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14184076.9 | 08.01.2009 | [2015/03] | Priority number, date | US20080019830P | 08.01.2008 Original published format: US 19830 P | US20080030454P | 21.02.2008 Original published format: US 30454 P | US20080340205 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: US 340205 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2824929 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2824929 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/147, H04N19/124, H04N19/132, H04N19/19, H04N19/18, H04N19/91 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/13 (US);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | Quantisierung basierend auf Ratenverzerrungsoptimierungsmodellierung für Cabac-Codierer | [2015/03] | English: | Quantization based on rate-distortion modeling for cabac coders | [2015/03] | French: | Quantification basée sur une modélisation débit-distorsion pour codeurs CABAC | [2015/03] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 03.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09700776.9 / EP2243296 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006005182 (SLIPSTREAM DATA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,8-13 * page 6, lines 20-21 * * paragraphs [0099] - [0155] * * page 25, lines 1-18; figure 20 * * page 27, line 15 - page 28, line 2 * [I] 6,7; | [A]US5734755 (RAMCHANDRAN KANNAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 25-32 * * column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 57 * | [XP] - KARCZEWICZ M ET AL, "Rate distortion optimized quantization", 33. VCEG MEETING; 83. MPEG MEETING; 12-1-2008 - 13-1-2008; ANTALYA; (VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP OF ITU-T SG.16),, (20080109), no. VCEG-AH21, XP030003559 [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - RAMCHANDRAN K ET AL, "RATE-DISTORTION OPTIMAL FAST THRESHOLDING WITH COMPLETE JPEG/MPEG DECODER COMPATIBILITY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19940901), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 700 - 704, XP000476844 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.334973 | [Y] - EN-HUI YANG ET AL, "Rate Distortion Optimization of H.264 with Main Profile Compatibility", INFORMATION THEORY, 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20060701), ISBN 978-1-4244-0505-3, pages 282 - 286, XP031032214 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - WANG W ET AL, "Rate distortion optimized quantization for H.264/AVC based on dynamic programming", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 12-7-2005 - 15-7-2005; BEIJING,, (20050712), XP030081056 [A] 1-13 * Abstract, Introduction; page 2100 - page 2101 * | by applicant | - DETLEV MARPE; HEIKO SCHWARZ; THOMAS WIEGAND, "Context-based Adaptive Binary Arithmetic Coding in the H.264/AVC Video Compression Standard", IEEE TRANSLATIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (200307), vol. 13, no. 7 |