EP2823872 - Pressure swing adsorption process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weist Jr., Edward Landis 5235 Miller Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 02 /
Wu, Dingjun 5754 Fresh Meadow Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | 03 /
Xu, Jianguo 131 Fox Hill Drive Wrightstown, PA 18940 / US | 04 /
Herb, Blaine Edward 7844 Sassafras Road New Tripoli, PA 18066 / US | 05 /
Hoke Jr., Bryan Clair 234 Longwood Drive Bethlehem, PA 18020 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14184485.2 | 11.09.2014 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2823872 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2823872 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/047 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP);
B01D2256/16 (EP);
B01D2256/18 (EP);
B01D2257/102 (EP);
B01D2257/502 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2257/7022 (EP);
B01D2257/7025 (EP);
B01D2259/40033 (EP);
B01D2259/40041 (EP);
B01D2259/40075 (EP);
B01D2259/40079 (EP);
B01D2259/40081 (EP);
B01D2259/4068 (EP);
Y02C20/20 (EP);
Y02C20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2015/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Druckwechsel-Adsorptionsverfahren | [2015/03] | English: | Pressure swing adsorption process | [2015/03] | French: | Procédé d'adsorption à pression alternée | [2015/03] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 29.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3986849 (FUDERER ANDRIJA, et al); | [I]US5294247 (SCHARPF ERIC W [US], et al); | [I]DE19506762 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [I]EP1228799 (UOP LLC [US]); | [IDY]US2003015091 (XU JIANGUO [US], et al); | [XDYI]US8496733 (BAKSH MOHAMED S A [US], et al); | [YD]US2013239807 (WEIST JR EDWARD LANDIS [US], et al) | by applicant | US4461630 | US4512779 | US4783203 | US5082474 | US5232473 | US5254154 | US6379431 | US2003015091 | US6565628 | US6585804 | EP1486245 | US2005098034 | US2005268780 | US7179324 | US7537742 | US7550030 | US2012174776 | US8394171 | US8496733 | US2013239807 | US8545601 |