EP2849106 - Medical image managing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2019/24] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dutta, Rakesh 926-1803, 73, Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 14184927.3 | 16.09.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | KR20130112068 | 17.09.2013 Original published format: KR 20130112068 | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2849106 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2849106 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2849106 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/58 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (KR);
G06F16/58 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F9/44 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2015/12] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung medizinischer Bilder | [2015/12] | English: | Medical image managing method and apparatus | [2015/12] | French: | Procédé de gestion d'image médicale et appareil | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2014 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | GB | 16.09.2019 | IE | 16.09.2019 | LU | 16.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1176538 (NIDEK KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; claim - * [I] 2,6,9,13; | [XI]WO2006040258 (AGFA INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,10-12,15 * abstract * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 9 * * page 6, line 28 - page 114 * [I] 6,7,13,14; | [A]US2008212855 (SHIBUYA MASATO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-9,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] ** paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] *; | [XI]DE102007040838 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,8,10,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * [I] 2,6,9,13 |