EP2851830 - Mobile information gateway for use in emergency situations or with special equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balram, Nikhil c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Berkner, Kathrin c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Tosic, Ivana c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Wu, Wanmin c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/13] | 01 /
Balram, Nikhil c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
02 /
Berkner, Kathrin c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
Tosic, Ivana c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
04 /
Wu, Wanmin c/o RICOH INNOVATIONS, INC. 2882 Sand Hill Road, Suite 115 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14184938.0 | 16.09.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | US201361880971P | 22.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361880971 P | US201414161613 | 22.01.2014 Original published format: US201414161613 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851830 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851830 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/32, G02B26/10, H04M11/04, H04W4/12, G02B27/01, H04W4/90, G06F3/01 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
G02B27/00 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0167 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | G06F21/32, G02B27/00, G06F3/01, G06F21/62, G06Q30/00, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | Mobiles Informations-Gateway zur Verwendung in Notsituationen oder mit Spezialausrüstung | [2015/13] | English: | Mobile information gateway for use in emergency situations or with special equipment | [2015/13] | French: | Passerelle mobile d'information destinée à être utilisée dans des situations d'urgence ou avec un équipement spécial | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 27.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2014 | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | IE | 16.09.2019 | LU | 16.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.09.2014 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008005702 (SKOURUP CHARLOTTE [NO], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0049] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0068] * * claims 1-25 ** figures 1-2 *; | [X]US2012200601 (OSTERHOUT RALPH F [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0096] * * paragraphs [0426] - [0427] * * paragraphs [0516] - [0522] * * paragraph [0582] * * paragraphs [0596] - [0597] * * paragraphs [0837] - [0846] * * paragraphs [0898] - [0900] * * claim 1 * | by applicant | - JAMES; JOHN T., "A New, Evidence-Based Estimate of Patient Harms Associated with Hospital Care", JOURNAL OF PATIENT SAFETY, (2013), vol. 00, no. 00 |