EP2853459 - Apparatus, vehicle, and method for operating vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2020/25] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lu, Xi 1800 Cai Lun Road Pudong Shanghei 201203 / CN | 02 /
Li, Fei 1800 Cai Lun Road Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
Zhou, Jian 1800 Cai Lun Road Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
Qiu, Hai 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | 05 /
Zhou, Ronghui 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | 06 /
Shen, Xiangming 1800 Cai Lun Road Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
Sun, Fengcheng 1800 Cai Lun Road Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2020/25] |
Former [2015/14] | 01 /
Lu, Xi 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | ||
02 /
Li, Fei 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | |||
03 /
Zhou, Jian 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | |||
04 /
Qiu, Hai 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | |||
05 /
Zhou, Ronghui 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | |||
06 /
Shen, Xiangming 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | |||
07 /
Sun, Fengcheng 1800 Cai Lun Road 201203 Pudong / CN | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2015/14] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14185231.9 | 17.09.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | CN201310429818 | 18.09.2013 Original published format: CN201310429818 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2853459 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2853459 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2853459 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60L50/51, B60L58/10, B60W30/18, B60L7/16, H02P3/14, H02P6/00, B60L15/20, B60L50/50 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L50/51 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B60L7/16 (US);
H02P3/14 (US);
H02P6/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | B60W30/18, B60L11/18, B60L7/16, H02P3/14, H02P6/00, B60L15/20 | ||
Former IPC [2015/14] | B60W30/18, B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2015/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Fahrzeug und Verfahren zum Betrieb von Fahrzeugen | [2015/14] | English: | Apparatus, vehicle, and method for operating vehicle | [2015/14] | French: | Appareil, véhicule et procédé de fonctionnement de véhicule | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 24.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2014 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | GB | 17.09.2020 | IE | 17.09.2020 | LU | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.09.2014 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GB | 17.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
GB | 17.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
IE | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
LU | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5309073 (KANEKO SATORU [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 6, line 44 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010206100 (VYAS PARAG [DE], et al) [A] 1,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0044]; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2011025236 (TAKIZAWA SATOKI [JP]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0011] - [0 36] - [0104] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP2597772 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,5,14,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0 11] - [0018]; figure 1 * | by applicant | CN20131084090 |