EP2997945 - Foldable wheelchair having a stiffer construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invacare International Sàrl Route de Cité-Ouest 2 1196 Gland / CH | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Küschall, Rainer Ringstrasse 15 4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
Nicolas, Bernard 14 Rue A. Boehringer 68100 Mulhouse / FR | 03 /
Brenner, Simon Oberwilwrstrasse 112 4054 Basel / CH | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 14185669.0 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997945 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/08 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A61G5/0883 (EP,US);
A61G5/08 (EP,US);
A61G5/0816 (EP,US);
A61G5/0866 (EP,US);
A61G5/1054 (EP,US);
A61G5/1078 (EP,US);
A61G5/021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbarer Rollstuhl mit Versteiferkonstruktion | [2016/12] | English: | Foldable wheelchair having a stiffer construction | [2016/12] | French: | Fauteuil roulant pliable présentant une construction plus rigide | [2016/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2662060 (WOLTURNUS AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1060724 (SUNRISE MEDICAL HHG INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0031]; figures 3-5,10,11 *; | [YA]EP0163139 (VALUTEC AG [CH]) [Y] 4 * figures 3a-3d * [A] 1-3,5-15; | [A]EP1181918 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0121]; figure 14 *; | [A]EP2606868 (INVACARE INT SARL [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5758897 |