EP2851279 - Kite powered vessel having a movable keel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leemans, Hilbrand 27, c/ Chafariz 35542 Tabayesco, Lanzarote / ES | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2015/13] | Application number, filing date | 14185936.3 | 23.09.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | NL20132011490 | 23.09.2013 Original published format: NL 2011490 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851279 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B63B41/00, B63B1/04, B63B35/79 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
B63B41/00 (EP);
B63H8/16 (EP,US);
B63B1/042 (EP);
B63B32/64 (EP,US);
B63H9/072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drachenangetriebenes Schiff mit einem beweglichem Kiel | [2015/13] | English: | Kite powered vessel having a movable keel | [2015/13] | French: | Navire tracté par un cerf-volant comportant une quille mobile | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 15.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR355247 (DEMETRU RADULESCU [FR], et al) [A] 1,14 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3972300 (ADAMSKI LEO J) [A] 1,14 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2518489 (COCAGNE JEAN JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4686922 (BURROUGHS RALPH B [US]) [A] 1,14 * figures 4-5 *; | [A]DE4340028 (ZUEHLKE ERNST W DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1,14 * figures 3,5,7 *; | [A]WO2011095178 (VOEGLER INGO [IN]) [A] 1,14* figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2005100149 |