03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
05.07.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
13.10.2018 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
24.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.04.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
25.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
21.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.11.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
04.11.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
26.05.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |