EP2854075 - Vehicle control system and image sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-Cho Kariya City Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murao, Toshikazu c/o DENSO CORPORATION, Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Shiota, Kentarou c/o DENSO CORPORATION, Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Naoki c/o DENSO CORPORATION, Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Takayuki c/o DENSO CORPORATION, Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14186537.8 | 26.09.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | JP20130199973 | 26.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013199973 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2854075 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2854075 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/20 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G06V20/56 (EP,CN,US);
B60Q9/00 (CN);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06V10/143 (EP,CN,US);
H04N7/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsteuerungssystem und -bildsensor | [2015/14] | English: | Vehicle control system and image sensor | [2015/14] | French: | Système de commande de véhicule et capteur d'image | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 07.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/49] | 18.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1400916 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [XI]EP1887492 (MOBILEYE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY]); | [XI]DE102007034608 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2010254595 (MIYAMOTO SHINICHI [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011233763 |