Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
14.11.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.03.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
22.04.2015 | Change - representative |