EP3000991 - Casing of a turbo machine, method for manufacturing such a casing and gas turbine with such a casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Johannes Breitistrasse 17 8953 Dietikon / CH | 02 /
Cataldi, Giovanni Werdgartenstrasse 4 8004 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Wiedemann, Nikolas Moosäckerstrasse 4 5442 Fislisbach / CH | 04 /
Busekros, Armin Im oberen Boden 23 8049 Zürich / CH | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | General Electric Technology GmbH CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 14186851.3 | 29.09.2014 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000991 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/26 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
F01D25/26 (EP);
F05D2260/941 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gehäuse einer Turbomaschine, Verfahren zur Herstellung solch eines Gehäuses und Gasturbine mit solch einem Gehäuse | [2016/13] | English: | Casing of a turbo machine, method for manufacturing such a casing and gas turbine with such a casing | [2016/13] | French: | Carter de turbomachine, procédé de fabrication d'un tel carter et turbine à gaz avec un tel carter | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005132707 (GEBHARDT ANDREAS [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 3, paragraph 36 - paragraph 37; figures 4-6 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]EP0073689 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 3; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]US2009097968 (BALLARD JR HENRY GRADY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 2, paragraph 26 - paragraph 27; figures 2A, 2B, 3A, 5 * [I] 3,8; | [XI]EP2623719 (PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * page 2, paragraph 10; figure 2 * [I] 3,8 | by applicant | US4522559 |