01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
20.12.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
11.01.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.09.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.08.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2018 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.04.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
15.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.01.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
11.09.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.03.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
27.02.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |