Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10406566 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B2 | US2017259308 | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | US201414495314 | 24.09.2014 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | US201715608554 | 30.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6585243B | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | B2 | JP2018164118 | 18.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015090297 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170028914 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101971303B | Global Dossier | 22.04.2019 | B1 | KR20150037507 | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6426927B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2018 | B2 | JP2015092538 | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104517809B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | B | CN104517809 | 15.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2854164 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2019 | B1 | EP2854164 | 01.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI649822B | 01.02.2019 | B | TW201526141 | 01.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013205172 | 30.09.2013 | JP2014141828 | 09.07.2014 |