EP3002265 - Mixture for producing a fire resistant magnesia carbon product or a fire resistant alumina magnesia carbon product, method for the production of such a product, such a product and the use of a product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebner, Clemens Lendplatz 12 8020 Graz / AT | 02 /
Neubauer, Bernd Turmgasse 3d 8700 Leoben / AT | 03 /
Rief, Andreas Salzlände 17a 8700 Leoben / AT | 04 /
Trummer, Bernd Grüne Gasse 35 8020 Graz / AT | 05 /
Maranitsch, Alexander Klederinger Str. 56/26 1100 Wien / AT | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Berkenbrink, Kai-Oliver Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2016/14] | Application number, filing date | 14187322.4 | 01.10.2014 | [2016/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3002265 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3002265 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/043, C04B35/103, C04B35/66, C04B35/634, C04B35/638 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
C04B35/043 (EP,RU,US);
C04B35/107 (US);
C04B35/013 (RU);
C04B35/05 (US);
C04B35/103 (EP,US);
C04B35/443 (RU);
C04B35/6303 (US);
C04B35/634 (EP,US);
C04B35/63476 (RU);
C04B35/63496 (RU);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/66 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/14] | C04B35/01, C04B35/04, C04B35/10, C04B35/634, C04B35/638, C04B35/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2016/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Versatz zur Herstellung eines feuerfesten Magnesiakohlenstofferzeugnisses oder eines feuerfesten Alumina-Magnesia-Kohlenstofferzeugnisses, ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Erzeugnisses, ein solches Erzeugnis sowie die Verwendung eines solchen Erzeugnisses | [2016/14] | English: | Mixture for producing a fire resistant magnesia carbon product or a fire resistant alumina magnesia carbon product, method for the production of such a product, such a product and the use of a product | [2016/14] | French: | Déport destiné à la fabrication d'un produit en carbone à la magnésie ou un produit en carbone - magnésie -aluminate, procédé de fabrication d'un tel produit, un tel produit et son utilisation | [2016/14] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2017 | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2014 | AL | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | IE | 01.10.2017 | LU | 01.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
IE | 01.10.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 01.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4912068 (MICHAEL DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * Spalte 1, Z.5-10; Spalte 2, Z. 61-68;; claims 1,2,4,8,10,16 *; | [X]US4957887 (MICHAEL DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * Zusammenfassung; Spalte 1, Z. 10-17;; claims 5,12,20,21 *; | [Y]US5171495 (LUHRSEN ERNST [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * Spalte 3, Z. 51-62; Spalte 4, Z. 11-15;; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5262367 (SUNDELL DAVID R [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * Zusammenfassung;Spalte 1, Z. 5-13;; claims 17,18 *; | [Y]US5866490 (WATANABE AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9* Spalte 5, Z. 57-64; "resins 2 and 4";; example 7; table 1 *; | [X]JP2000044357 (HARIMA CERAMIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,3-8 * Zusammenfassung; Anspruch 1; Absatz [0016] *; | [Y]EP1873128 (KROSAKIHARIMA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * Seite 15, Beispiel 8;; claims 6,7,13 *; | [XI] - BAG MOUSOM ED - MOUSOM BAG, "Development of Environment Friendly New Generation MgO-C Brick Using Nano Carbon", Roukela, India, (20111201), pages FP - 73, THESIS: DEVELOPMENT OF ENVIRONMENT FRIENDLY NEW GENERATION MGO-C BRICK USING NANO CARBON, ROURKELA, INDIA, URL: http://ethesis.nitrkl.ac.in/2896/1/mousom_thesis1.pdf, (20141118), XP002732633 [X] 1,3-9 * Seite 9, erster Absatz; Seite 12, Tabelle 2.2; Seiten 15,20; Abschnitt 3.3- Seiten 24-27. * [I] 2 | [X] - KANNO K ET AL, "Mesophase pitch and phenolic resin blends as binders for magnesia-graphite bricks", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (19990201), vol. 37, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0008-6223(98)00152-3, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 195 - 201, XP004481369 [X] 1,3-8 * Abschnitte 2, 3.1; Seite 2, rechte Spalte,letzter Absatz.;; tables 2,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6223(98)00152-3 | Examination | - ANEZIRIS C G ET AL, "Magnesia- Carbon-Bricks- A high-duty Refr. Material", INTERCERAM, SCHMID, FREIBURG, DE, (20030101), ISSN 0020-5214, pages 22 - 27, XP002477891 | by applicant | EP1704128 |