EP3007114 - Method of and system for controlling a manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raviola, Alessandro Via Laviosa 37/21 16156 Genova / IT | 02 /
Reggio, Elena Salita Carupola 44 16133 Genova / IT | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14187907.2 | 07.10.2014 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007114 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (CN);
G05B19/4155 (US);
G05B19/402 (US);
G05B2219/31372 (US);
G05B2219/32252 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Steuerung eines Herstellungsprozesses | [2016/15] | English: | Method of and system for controlling a manufacturing process | [2016/15] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de commander un processus de fabrication | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2244214 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2320361 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2365410 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I]EP2639753 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2682905 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * |