EP3006560 - Miwi2 as a marker for spermatogonial stem cells and method for diagnosing spermatogonial stem cells based on said marker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Molecular Biology Laboratory Meyerhofstrasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Carroll, Dónal c/o EMBL European Molecular Biology Laboratory Meyerhofstrasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Carrieri, Claudia Via del Francese, 21 00015 Monterotondo (Rome) / IT | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14188341.3 | 09.10.2014 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3006560 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/076 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
C12N5/061 (EP);
C12Q1/6881 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Miwi2 als Marker für Spermatogoniestammzellen und Verfahren zur Diagnose von Spermatogoniestammzellen auf Basis dieses Markers | [2016/15] | English: | Miwi2 as a marker for spermatogonial stem cells and method for diagnosing spermatogonial stem cells based on said marker | [2016/15] | French: | Miwi2 comme marqueur pour des cellules souches spermatogoniales et procédé de diagnostic de cellules souches spermatogoniales basé sur ce marqueur | [2016/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011057123 (PRIMEGEN BIOTECH LLC DBA REPROCYTE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * paragraph [0114] *; | [A]WO2010127399 (INST MEDICAL W & E HALL [AU], et al) [A] 14 * page 72, line 3; table 10 * | [X] - SHINOHARA T ET AL, "Spermatogonial stem cell enrichment by multiparameter selection of mouse testis cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20000718), vol. 97, no. 15, doi:10.1073/PNAS.97.15.8346, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8346 - 8351, XP003004039 [X] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * page 8346, column r, paragraph 3; tables 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.15.8346 | [X] - HIROKO MORIMOTO ET AL, "Phenotypic Plasticity of Mouse Spermatogonial Stem Cells", PLOS ONE, (20091119), vol. 4, no. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0007909, page e7909, XP055158187 [X] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * page e7909, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0007909 | [X] - VALLI HANNA ET AL, "Fluorescence- and magnetic-activated cell sorting strategies to isolate and enrich human spermatogonial stem cells", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, (20140802), vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FERTNSTERT.2014.04.036, ISSN 0015-0282, page 566, XP029012278 [X] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * page 567, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2014.04.036 | [AD] - WEI DENG ET AL, "miwi, a Murine Homolog of piwi, Encodes a Cytoplasmic Protein Essential for Spermatogenesis", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, (20020601), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00165-X, ISSN 1534-5807, pages 819 - 830, XP055158798 [AD] 1-15 * page 822, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00165-X | [AD] - CARMELL MICHELLE A ET AL, "MIWI2 is essential for spermatogenesis and repression of transposons in the mouse male germline", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20070401), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.DEVCEL.2007.03.001, ISSN 1534-5807, pages 503 - 514, XP002500307 [AD] 1-15 * page 504, column l, paragraph 3rd; figure 6 * * page 511, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.devcel.2007.03.001 | by applicant | - CARMELL ET AL., "MIWI2 is essential for spermatogenesis and repression of transposons in the mouse male germline", DEV CELL., (20070329), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.devcel.2007.03.001, pages 503 - 14, XP002500307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.devcel.2007.03.001 | - DENG ET AL., "miwi, a murine homolog of piwi, encodes a cytoplasmic protein essential for spermatogenesis", DEV CELL, (200206), vol. 2, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00165-X, pages 819 - 30, XP055158798 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1534-5807(02)00165-X | - GU ET AL., "Genetic variants in Piwi-interacting RNA pathway genes confer susceptibility to spermatogenic failure in a Chinese population", HUM REPROD., (20101011), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1093/humrep/deq274, pages 2955 - 61, XP055158922 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/deq274 | - SINGH ET AL., "Spermatogonial stem cells, infertility, and testicular cancer", J CELL MOL MED., (201103), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1582-4934.2010.01242.x, pages 468 - 483, XP055158185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2010.01242.x |