EP2862511 - Sensor for foetal monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nemo Healthcare B.V. De Lismortel 31 5312 AR Eindhoven / NL | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, Christiaan Hendrik Leonard Ouvertureweg 36 5245 AV Rosmalen / NL | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 14188880.0 | 14.10.2014 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | US201314054091 | 15.10.2013 Original published format: US201314054091 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2862511 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0448, A61B5/0492 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/288 (EP,US);
A61B5/4343 (US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/4325 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2015/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensor zur Fötusüberwachung | [2015/17] | English: | Sensor for foetal monitoring | [2015/17] | French: | Capteur pour surveillance foetale | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3380445 (FRASIER JORDAN D) [X] 1-4,9,11,13 * figure 6 * [I] 5,12; | [A]US4742828 (SUNDSTROEM HOLGER B [SE]) [A] 8* column 3, lines 46-50; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US5125405 (SCHMID WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,11,13 * column 6, lines 7-63; figures 3,4 * [I] 10; | [X]JPH08299294 (NIPPON SOGO IGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1-4,9,11,13 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]DE19809930 (WINKLER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,13 * figures 1,4 * [I] 6,8; | [Y]US2007191728 (SHENNIB ADNAN [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0065]; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US2011196220 (STORM HANNE [NO]) [X] 1-4,9,11,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0016] , [0019] , [0020]; figure 1 * [Y] 10 [I] 7,8,14,15; | [XYI]JP2012183082 (FUKUDA DENSHI KK) [X] 1-6,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0022]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 10 [I] 14,15; | [X]US2013018249 (STORM HANNE [NO]) [X] 1,2,7,9,11,13 * paragraphs [0027] , [0051] , [0052]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2007095457 | US2012150010 | WO2013130979 | EP20120199341 |