Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
02.08.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.01.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.09.2015 | Change - designated states | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
11.09.2015 | Change - request for examination | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
10.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.03.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
19.02.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.01.2015 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
16.10.2014 | Change - representative |