EP2863492 - Connector with a locking element with wings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/18] | Connector with a primary locking element and a connector position assurance (CPA) with wings | ||
[2021/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Automotive GmbH Oberer Paspelsweg 6-8 6830 Rankweil-Brederis / AT | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bitschnau, René Laternserstr. 46 6835 Zwischenwasser / AT | 02 /
Kalb, Markus Schorenquelle 4 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2021/28] |
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
Bitschnau, René Laternserstr. 46 6835 Zwischenwasser / AT | ||
02 /
Kalb, Markus Schorenquelle 2 6850 Dornbirn / AT | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14189227.3 | 16.10.2014 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | DE20131017152 | 16.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013017152 | [2015/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863492 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2863492 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/639, H01R13/627, H01R13/641 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
H01R13/639 (EP);
H01R13/6272 (EP);
H01R13/641 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2015/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steckverbinder mit einem Primärverriegelung und einer Steckerpositionssicherung (CPA) mit Flügeln | [2015/17] | English: | Connector with a locking element with wings | [2021/04] | French: | Connecteur à fiche doté d'un élément de verrouillage à ailettes | [2021/04] |
Former [2015/18] | Connector with a primary locking element and a connector position assurance (CPA) with wings | ||
Former [2015/18] | Connecteur à fiche doté d'un élément primaire de verrouillage et un dispositif d'assurance de position du connecteur (CPA) à ailettes | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 10.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2014 | AL | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | TR | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | AT | 16.10.2021 | IE | 16.10.2021 | LU | 16.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.10.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
AT | 16.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.10.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
AT | 16.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 16.10.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
AT | 16.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
AT | 16.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IE | 16.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
LU | 16.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | DK | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | DK | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 14.07.2021 | |
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | FI | 14.07.2021 | |
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 14.07.2021 | |
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10341136 (HIRSCHMANN AUSTRIA GMBH RANKWE [AT]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2009047744 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 * * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 32 *; | [X]WO2013092310 (DELPHI CONNECTION SYSTEMS HOLDING FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 * * page 6, line 6 - page 10, line 33 *; | [A]DE112011103111T (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0062] * | by applicant | DE10341136 |