19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
15.06.2017 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
19.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
08.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.12.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
25.12.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
16.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
21.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|