EP2879000 - Projector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito City Osaka Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito city Osaka 574-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanehira, Takaharu c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito City Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14189564.9 | 20.10.2014 | [2015/23] | Priority number, date | JP20130227367 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013227367 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879000 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/14, G06F3/042 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
G03B43/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/0418 (US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2015/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Projektorvorrichtung | [2015/23] | English: | Projector device | [2015/23] | French: | Dispositif projecteur | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 25.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5736975 (LUNETTA DONALD M [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6008800 (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]) [X] 11 * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 45; figures 2a-2d * [Y] 1-10,12-16; | [A]US2001012001 (REKIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]JP2005078291 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [YA]JP2008051861 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-10,12-16 * abstract * [A] 11; | [AD]JP2009070245 (RICOH KK) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009070245 |