EP2862764 - Longitudinal force control apparatus and saddled or straddle type vehicle having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamane, Hayato c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Hiroyuki c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Takahiro c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438-8501 / JP | 04 /
Seki, Yoshimichi c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi Shizouka-ken, 438-8501 / JP | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2015/17] | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14189675.3 | 21.10.2014 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | JP20130218224 | 21.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013218224 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2862764 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2862764 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2862764 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/045, B60W10/06, B60W10/184, B60W30/18, // B60W50/00 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W30/04 (US);
B60W30/18145 (EP,US);
B60W30/18172 (EP,US);
B62J27/00 (EP);
B62K11/04 (EP);
B60W2030/043 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0033 (EP,US);
B60W2300/36 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2520/125 (EP,US);
B60W2520/14 (EP,US);
B60W2520/18 (EP,US);
B60W2520/20 (EP,US);
B60W2520/28 (EP,US);
B60W2540/30 (EP,US);
B60W2552/00 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0627 (EP,US);
B60W2710/182 (EP,US);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US);
B60W2720/14 (EP,US);
B60W2720/20 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | B60W30/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | Längskraftsteuerungsvorrichtung und Sattel- oder Grätschsitzfahrzeug damit | [2015/17] | English: | Longitudinal force control apparatus and saddled or straddle type vehicle having the same | [2015/17] | French: | Appareil de commande de force longitudinale et véhicule de type califourchon ou à selle doté d'un tel appareil | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2014 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | RS | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 21.10.2014 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IS | 06.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.10.2014 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RS | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013014945 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [P]EP2738075 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [P] * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102010039823 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] * * claims 2-3 *; | [A]DE102008021523 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 5 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0077] - [0082] *; | [A]DE102009046226 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1769990 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document * | by applicant | JP4402379B | JP2013523532 |