EP2853240 - Modular orthopaedic hip prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carr, Jonathan E. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 02 /
Hood, Megan A. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 03 /
Satterthwaite, Rodney E. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 04 /
McCleary, Larry G. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 05 /
Furbee, Rebecca M. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 06 /
Muhammad, William c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 07 /
Fortin, Michael J. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 08 /
Lashure, Daniel E. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | 09 /
Gheevarughese, Vineetha S. c/o DePuy Synthes Products, LLC 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/14] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14189764.5 | 05.04.2012 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | US201161472500P | 06.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161472500 P | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2853240 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2853240 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61F2/30734 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4684 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/164 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1668 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4607 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4637 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/4657 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30235 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30507 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30515 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3054 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30617 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/30738 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3652 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/3674 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4622 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/14] | A61F2/32, A61F2/46, A61B17/16, A61B17/88, A61F2/30, A61F2/36, A61B17/00, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2015/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Modulare orthopädische Hüftprothese | [2015/22] | English: | Modular orthopaedic hip prosthesis | [2015/14] | French: | Prothèse orthopédique modulaire de la hanche | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/14] | Instrumentenanordnung zur Implantation einer Revisionshüftprothese | ||
Former [2015/14] | Ensemble instrument pour implanter une prothèse de la hanche à tige de révision | Examination procedure | 29.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12768276.3 / EP2693988 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2012 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 05.04.2012 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4693724 (RHENTER JEAN L [FR], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,3 * [I] 2; | [A]US2007299534 (LEWIS PAUL P [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US6149687 (GRAY JR WAYNE P [US], et al) [A] 3 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * column 3, line 19 - line 23 *; | [A]FR2832624 (SCIENCE MEDECINE SA [FR]) [A] 4 * figures 4,5 * * page 5, line 19 - line 36 * | by applicant | US2011302760 | US2012053698 |