EP2876262 - Fan containment system for an axial gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/22] | Gas turbine engine | ||
[2019/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Care, Ian c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Harper, Cedric c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2015/22] | Vaughan, Sarah Elizabeth, et al Rolls-Royce plc SinB-38 PO Box 31 Derby Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14190217.1 | 24.10.2014 | [2015/22] | Priority number, date | GB20130020611 | 22.11.2013 Original published format: GB 201320611 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876262 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2876262 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04, F01D25/24, F02C7/04, F02C7/05, F04D29/52 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F04D29/526 (US);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F02C7/05 (EP,US);
F04D19/002 (US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | F01D21/04, F01D25/24, F02C7/04, F02C7/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fan-Rückhaltesystem für ein axiales Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2019/07] | English: | Fan containment system for an axial gas turbine engine | [2019/07] | French: | Système de confinement de soufflante pour un moteur à turbine à gaz axial | [2019/07] |
Former [2015/22] | Gasturbinenmotor | ||
Former [2015/22] | Gas turbine engine | ||
Former [2015/22] | Moteur à turbine à gaz | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2014 | AL | 03.04.2019 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | IE | 24.10.2019 | LU | 24.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.10.2014 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
IE | 24.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
LU | 24.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5456576 (LYON BRUCE V [US]) [Y] 12-15* figure 7 *; | [XY]US2011044806 (HARPER CEDRIC B [GB]) [X] 1,7 * figure 2a * [Y] 2-6,8-15; | [Y]EP2305984 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 8-11 * figure 3 *; | [XY]EP2495400 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,7 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-6,8-15; | [Y]US2013051998 (O' TOOLE JAMES [GB], et al) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0069]; figure 3A *; | [XY]EP2620652 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0044] , [0046]; figure 2 * [Y] 2-6,8-15 |