EP2991406 - Terminal device and method for controlling wireless communication state to comply with requirements of regulatory bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/09] | TERMINAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION STATE TO COMPLY WITH REQUIREMENTS OF REGULATORY BODIES | ||
[2018/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Inc. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanno, Manabu c/o Sony Mobile Communications, Inc 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 14190489.6 | 27.10.2014 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | US201414473538 | 29.08.2014 Original published format: US201414473538 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991406 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2991406 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/00, // H04W48/02 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
H04W48/02 (EP,US);
H04W74/002 (US);
H04W64/00 (US);
H04W84/12 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | H04W48/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | Endgerätevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Status einer drahtlosen Kommunikation um die Regeln einer Aufsichtsbehörde zu erfüllen | [2018/03] | English: | Terminal device and method for controlling wireless communication state to comply with requirements of regulatory bodies | [2018/02] | French: | Dispositif terminal et procédé de commande d'état de communication sans fil pour satisfaire les règles d'une autorité régulatrice | [2018/02] |
Former [2016/09] | ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES STATUS EINER DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION UM DIE REGELN EINER AUFSICHTSBEHÖRDE | ||
Former [2016/09] | TERMINAL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING WIRELESS COMMUNICATION STATE TO COMPLY WITH REQUIREMENTS OF REGULATORY BODIES | ||
Former [2016/09] | DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉTAT DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL POUR SATISFAIRE LES RÈGLES D'UNE AUTORITÉ RÉGULATRICE | Examination procedure | 27.11.2014 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 04.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2014 | AL | 27.06.2018 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | GB | 27.10.2018 | IE | 27.10.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | LU | 27.10.2018 | MT | 27.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
MT | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
MT | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
MT | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
GB | 27.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8565107 (PEASE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 43-62 * * column 2, lines 54-59 ** column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 50 *; | [XI]US2014004868 (AGARDH KAARE ANDREAS [SE]) [X] 1-6,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0023] - [0029] - [0050] * [I] 7,8 |