EP2887097 - Architectures for high Navigation Satellite System integrity multi-constellation solution separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/26] | Architectures for high integrity multi-constellation solution separation | ||
[2022/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kana, Zdenek HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Dunik, Jindrich HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Orejas, Martin HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Dowling, Andrew Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/15] |
Former [2015/26] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14190750.1 | 28.10.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | US201314092454 | 27.11.2013 Original published format: US201314092454 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2887097 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2887097 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2887097 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/20, G01S19/42 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G01S19/20 (EP,US);
G01S19/421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | Architekturen zu Separationslösungen mit hoher integrität mit mehreren Konstellationen für Navigationssatellitensyteme | [2022/45] | English: | Architectures for high Navigation Satellite System integrity multi-constellation solution separation | [2022/45] | French: | Architectures pour la séparation des solutions multi-constellations à haute intégrité du système de navigation par satellite | [2022/45] |
Former [2015/26] | Architekturen zur Separation hochintegrierter Lösungen mit mehreren Konstellationen | ||
Former [2015/26] | Architectures for high integrity multi-constellation solution separation | ||
Former [2015/26] | Architectures pour séparation de solution multi-constellation à intégrité élevée | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | LU | 28.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - LEE, YOUNG C., "Investigation of Extending Receiver Autonomous Integrity Monitoring (RAIM) to Combined Use of Galileo and Modernized GPS", ION GNSS 17TH INT.TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION, (20040921), pages 1691 - 1698, XP055185607 [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 1696, last paragraph - page 1697, the first two paragraphs * [Y] 10 | [XP] - KANA ZDENEK ET AL, "Architectures for High Integrity Multi-Constellation Solution Separation", GNSS 2014 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 27TH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GNSS+ 2014), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20140912), pages 3554 - 3565, XP056007754 [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - LEE Y C ET AL, "Advanced RAIM Based on Inter-Constellation Comparisons to Detect Consistent Faults for LPV-200", GNSS 2010 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23RD INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GNSS 2010), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20100924), pages 272 - 284, XP056000197 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - Greenspan, "GPS and Inertial Integration", Global Positioning System: Theory and Applications Vol. II, (19960101), pages 187 - 194, XP055226222 [Y] 10 * figure 1c * * pages 187-189, section "Benefits of GPS/Inertial Integration" * * page 194, section "Tightly Coupled Mode" * | [A] - VANDERWERF ET AL, "FDE Using Multiple Integrated GPS/Inertial Kalman Filters in the Presence of Temporally and Spatially Correlated Ionospheric Errors", GPS 2001 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GPS 2001), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20010914), pages 2676 - 2685, XP056009032 [A] 10 * abstract * * Page 2677, sections "Solution Separation Method of FDE" and "The Hybrid Kalman Filter" * | Examination | - JOERGER M ET AL, "Integrity Risk and Continuity Risk for Fault Detection and Exclusion Using Solution Separation ARAIM", GNSS 2013 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL MEETING OF THE SATELLITE DIVISION OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION GNSS+ 2013), THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION, 8551 RIXLEW LANE SUITE 360 MANASSAS, VA 20109, USA, (20130920), pages 2702 - 2722, XP056007383 |