02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
20.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
07.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
16.02.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
22.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
10.03.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
28.02.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.11.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
07.10.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.11.2022 [2022/45] |
03.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
08.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.11.2015 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
13.11.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
23.06.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
22.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
29.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|