Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9784844 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2015145724 | 28.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314092454 | 27.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2887097 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2023 | B1 | EP2887097 | 16.12.2015 | A3 | EP2887097 | 24.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201314092454 | 27.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN3160DEL2014 | 10.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201314092454 | 27.11.2013 |