EP2868818 - Sink assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naber Holding GmbH & Co. KG Enschedestrasse 24 48529 Nordhorn / DE | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naber, Hans-Joachim Ottmarsumer Weg 220 48527 Nordhorn / DE | 02 /
Keller, Lisa Rathausplatz 4 07747 Jena / DE | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2015/19] | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstraße 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14190834.3 | 29.10.2014 | [2015/19] | Priority number, date | DE201320104890U | 31.10.2013 Original published format: DE 202013104890 U | [2015/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868818 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2868818 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/186, E03C1/18, A47J47/20 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
A47L17/02 (EP,US);
A47J47/20 (EP,US);
E03C1/18 (EP);
E03C1/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2015/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Spültischanordnung | [2015/19] | English: | Sink assembly | [2015/19] | French: | Système d'évier | [2015/19] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2014 | AL | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR990131 (CHAFFOTEAUX ET MAURY REUNIS ET) [Y] 7,9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2907052 (GEORGES LOUIS RAYMOND MARIE RE, et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US4336620 (GRESH PETER P) [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,7-13; | [I]EP1566494 (NIRO PLAN AG [CH]) [I] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1598488 (KLEIN JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1* figures 5a,5b *; | [Y]DE102005010907 (MAIER MAX [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2009095738 (GLEM GAS S P A [IT], et al) [Y] 7-13 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2011314599 (TUOSTO PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figure 5 * [Y] 3,5,7-13 |