EP2839764 - Juice extraction module for juicer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUC Electronics Co., Ltd. 280, Nowon-ro, Buk-gu Daegu 702-858 / KR | For all designated states Kim, Ji Tae 103-2002, Daehyeon e-pyeonhansesang Apt Daehyeon-dong, Buk-gu Daegu 702-918 / KR | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jong Boo 103-2002, Daehyeon e-pyeonhansesang Apt. Daehyeon-dong Buk-gu 702-918 Daegu / KR | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Gilbey, Vincent, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 14191743.5 | 08.11.2013 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | KR20120126516 | 09.11.2012 Original published format: KR 20120126516 | KR20120148417 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120148417 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839764 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839764 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J19/02 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
A23N1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A47J19/025 (EP,KR,US);
A47J19/02 (CN);
A47J19/06 (KR);
B30B9/12 (KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Saftextraktionsmodul für Entsafter | [2015/09] | English: | Juice extraction module for juicer | [2015/09] | French: | Module d'extraction de jus pour centrifugeuse | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 24.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13192226.2 / EP2730200 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010007290 (SEB SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 17 - page 15, line 5; figure - *; | [A]CN201767733U (BILIAN YANG) [A] 1,2 * see blade 17d; paragraphs [0026] - [0035]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2967034 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 24 - page 11, line 26; figure - *; | [A]KR20120054572 (KIM YOUNG KI [KR]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0028] - [0095]; figure - *; | [A]WO2012108588 (HYUN DAE HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,2* paragraphs [0036] - [0074]; figure - *; | [X]EP2497393 (TONGYANG INC [KR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0036] - [0086]; figures 3-6,9-10 * | by applicant | KR100793852B | KR100966607B |