EP2894332 - System and method for a pump with reduced form factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entegris, Inc. 129 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4600 / US | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cedrone, James 104 Magnolia Street Braintree, MA 02184 / US | 02 /
Gonnellla, George 24 Elliot Street Pepperell, MA 01463-0412 / US | 03 /
Gashgaee, Iraj 104 Robert Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14192045.4 | 20.11.2006 | [2015/29] | Priority number, date | WO2005US42127 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/042127 | US20050742435P | 05.12.2005 Original published format: US 742435 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894332 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2894332 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04B23/06, F04B13/00, F04B53/06, F04B53/16, F04B53/22, F04B43/04, F04B49/06 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
F04B43/04 (EP,KR,US);
F04B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F04B23/06 (EP,KR,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,KR,US);
F04B53/06 (EP,KR,US);
F04B53/10 (KR);
F04B53/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04B53/22 (EP,KR,US);
F04B7/0076 (KR,US);
F04B9/02 (KR,US);
F04B2201/0201 (KR,US);
F04B2201/0601 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/08] |
Former [2015/29] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für eine Pumpe mit reduziertem Formfaktor | [2015/29] | English: | System and method for a pump with reduced form factor | [2015/29] | French: | Système et procédé pour une pompe avec un facteur de forme réduit | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 08.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06838070.8 / EP1952022 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | GB | 20.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/50] | IT | 17.08.2016 | |
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | IT | 17.08.2016 | |
NL | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5772899 (SNODGRASS OCIE T [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003143085 (FLETCHER PETER C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5262068 (BOWERS WILLIAM F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20050051576 | US20060502729 | US20060602472 | US20050292559 | US20060364286 | US20060602508 | US20060602449 | WO2005US42127 | US20060602457 | US20050741660 | US20060841725 | US20060602465 | US20060602513 |