EP3009259 - Method of repairing a core stiffened structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. P.O. Box 482 Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US | [2016/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cribb III, Vance N. 304 Scenic View Drive Aledo, TX Texas 76008 / US | 02 /
Wardlaw, Robert 415 Settlers Ridge Drive Keller, TX Texas 76248 / US | 03 /
Modrzejewski, Brian S. 1506 Treehouse Lane South Keller, TX Texas 76262 / US | 04 /
Mueller, Byron 11651 Lavender Avenue Azle, TX Texas 76020 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14192418.3 | 10.11.2014 | [2016/16] | Priority number, date | US201414512837 | 13.10.2014 Original published format: US201414512837 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009259 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3009259 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C73/06, B32B37/24, B64C27/473, // B29C73/10, B29C44/12, B29C73/26, B29L31/08, B29L31/60, B32B38/00, B32B43/00, B64F5/00 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
B29C73/06 (EP,US);
B32B38/0004 (US);
B29C44/1285 (EP,US);
B29C44/18 (EP,US);
B29C73/02 (EP);
B32B37/24 (US);
B32B43/00 (US);
B64C27/473 (US);
B64F5/40 (EP,US);
B29C2073/264 (EP,US);
B29C73/10 (EP,US);
B29L2031/082 (EP,US);
B29L2031/608 (EP,US);
B32B2037/243 (US);
B32B2038/0076 (US);
B32B2038/0084 (US);
B32B2305/022 (US);
B32B2305/024 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/16] | B29C73/06, // B29C73/10, B29C44/12, B29C73/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reparatur einer kernversteiften Struktur | [2016/16] | English: | Method of repairing a core stiffened structure | [2016/16] | French: | Procédé de réparation d'une structure raidie par un noyau | [2016/27] |
Former [2016/16] | Procédé de réparation d'une structure raidie de noyau | Examination procedure | 10.11.2014 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2014 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.11.2014 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1870228 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018] * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [Y]US2009269547 (MEYER FRANCIS [FR], et al) [Y] 4,6,8,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0071] , [0072] ** figures 1-7 *; | [XY] - BLITZER T N ED - BITZER T, Sandwich panel repair, HONEYCOMB TECHNOLOGY : MATERIALS, DESIGN, MANUFACTURING, APPLICATIONS AND TESTING, CHAPMAN & HALL, GB, PAGE(S) 193 - 199, (19970101), ISBN 978-0-412-54050-9, XP008108799 [X] 1-3,5,7,10,12,13,15 * page 198, paragraph 1 * * page 199, paragraph 5 * * figure 9.2 * [Y] 4,6,8,11 |