blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news
blank News flashes
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2886874

EP2886874 - Radial impeller for a drum type ventilator and fan assembly having such a radial impeller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 01.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2023  [2023/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Gebert, Daniel
Am Rain 2
74613 Öhringen / DE
02 / Bohl, Katrin
Nagelsberger Weg 59
74653 Künzelsau / DE
03 / Reichert, Erik
Emilie-Geissler-Str. 13
97944 Boxberg / DE
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date14192425.810.11.2014
[2015/26]
Priority number, dateDE20131011460920.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013114609
[2015/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886874
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2015
ClassificationIPC:F04D29/28, F04D29/30, F04D29/68, // F04D29/42
[2015/26]
CPC:
F04D29/667 (EP); F04D29/281 (CN); F04D29/22 (US);
F04D17/08 (US); F04D29/282 (EP,US); F04D29/30 (EP,US); (+)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Radial-Laufrad für einen Trommellüfter und Lüftereinheit mit einem derartigen Radial-Laufrad[2015/26]
English:Radial impeller for a drum type ventilator and fan assembly having such a radial impeller[2015/26]
French:Roue radiale pour un ventilateur à tambour et ventilateur doté d'une telle roue radiale[2015/26]
Examination procedure13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
16.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/38]
12.05.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202209   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE60032493T  (BOSCH ROBERT CORP [US]);
 [XI]EP2594804  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP])
ExaminationGB1548471
 EP0846868
 JPH10176696
 US2008286130
 CN202833288U
by applicantDE102006031167
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.