EP3021255 - Identification tag for attachment to a metallurgical vessel, reading station and method for determining a wear status for the identification tag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuehas, Thomas Puerach 35 4225 Luftenberg / AT | 02 /
Rohrhofer, Andreas Zinoeggerweg 2/1/6 4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
Hartl, Franz Waldingerstr. 11/EG 1 4020 Linz / AT | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Metals Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/20] | Metals Linz c/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80560 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14192673.3 | 11.11.2014 | [2016/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021255 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/077 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06K19/0723 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2016/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Identifikationsmarke zum Anbringen an einem metallurgischen Gefäß, Lesestation und Verfahren zur Ermittlung eines Verschleißzustandes der Identifikationsmarke | [2016/20] | English: | Identification tag for attachment to a metallurgical vessel, reading station and method for determining a wear status for the identification tag | [2016/20] | French: | Marques d'identification destinées à être appliquées sur un récipient métallurgique, station de lecture et procédé de détermination d'un état d'usure des marques d'identification | [2016/20] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 19.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 02.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE102008011288 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2011140970 (FUKAGAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082]; figure 11 *; | [I]US2013043974 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al) [I] 1* paragraph [0189] * |