EP2860311 - Rainbow fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D W Spinks (Embossing) Ltd 26 Red Lion Square London WC1R 4AG / GB | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states D W Spinks (Embossing) Ltd Unit 3 Hale Wharf, Ferry Lane, Tottenham London N17 9NF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spinks, Gary Donald D. W. Spinks (Embossing) Limited Unit 3 Watermill Business Centre Edison Road Brimsdown, EN3 7XF / GB | [2015/16] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2015/16] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14192929.9 | 28.08.2003 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | GB20020021449 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0221449 | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860311 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2860311 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/48, D06P1/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
D06P1/0012 (EP,US);
D06P1/0096 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1348 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24455 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24463 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24769 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249964 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249965 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2965 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regenbogenfasern | [2015/16] | English: | Rainbow fibres | [2015/16] | French: | Fibres en arc-en-ciel | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03795055.7 / EP1546458 | EP08003077.8 / EP1930501 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, NL, MC, LU, IT, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 03.02.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2003 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | GB | 28.08.2017 | IE | 28.08.2017 | LU | 28.08.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 28.08.2003 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.08.2003 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.08.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.08.2017 | ||
LU | 28.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
GR | 15.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1095286 (PORTALS LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 39 - line 64 * * page 2, line 1 - line 22 *; | [A]US4655788 (JALON MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 7 - line 58 *; | [A]EP0342929 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 5-12 * * column 1, lines 41-60 * * column 3, lines 21-41 *; | [A]US4897300 (BOEHM MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 26 - line 30 * * column 3, line 29 - line 38 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 56 - line 62 * * column 5, line 4 - line 8 *; | [A]EP0388090 (DE LA RUE CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 1-23 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 29 *; | [A]EP0520060 (NACIONAL MONEDA TIMBRE [ES]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 3 - line 8 * * column 1, line 37 - line 38 * * column 2, line 14 - line 20 * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 10 *; | [A]US5744000 (ATHEY GRAHAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO9945200 (KOREA SECURITY PRINTING AND MI [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |