EP2899404 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP IMPELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler Motor GmbH Anne-Frank-Str. 33-35 90459 Nürnberg / DE | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernreuther, Georg Rednitzstr. 50 90449 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Ihle, Olai Kolpingstr. 37 90542 Eckental / DE | 03 /
Weiske, Klaus Nürnberger Straße 31 90571 Schwaig / DE | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 14193081.8 | 13.11.2014 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | DE201410201487 | 28.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014201487 | [2015/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899404 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D29/02, F04D29/22, // B29C65/02, B29L31/00, B29C65/08, B29C65/48, B29C65/60, B29C65/00, B29C65/78, B29L31/08 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
F04D13/0606 (EP,US);
F04D1/04 (US);
F04D13/0673 (EP,US);
F04D17/08 (US);
F04D29/026 (EP,US);
F04D29/22 (US);
F04D29/2227 (EP,US);
F04D29/42 (US);
F04D29/426 (US);
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B29C65/48 (EP,US);
B29C65/606 (EP,US);
B29C65/7829 (EP,US);
B29C66/12464 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29L2031/08 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7496 (EP,US);
F04D13/026 (US);
F05D2300/43 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2081/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | F04D13/06, F04D29/02, F04D29/22, // B29C65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KREISELPUMPENLAUFRAD | [2019/19] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL PUMP IMPELLER | [2015/31] | French: | ROUE DE POMPE CENTRIFUGE | [2015/31] |
Former [2015/31] | Kreiselpumpenlaufrad | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6456997 (SEIKOW CHEM ENG MACH) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE20022013U (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10321868 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]JP2007120445 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 6 *; | [ID]WO2011131251 (PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al) [ID] 1-6,12 * figures 1-3 * * page 6, line 29 - page 8, line 6 *; | [A]EP2644901 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0028] * | by applicant | WO2011131251 |