EP2879037 - Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/17] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | ||
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Younghoon c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Ji, Jaeyoung 37, Soraji-ro 243beon-gil Paju-si, Gyeonggi-do, 413-160 / KR | 03 /
Jeong, Byoungzoo c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Junghyun c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Kim, Nayeoung c/o LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 137-893 Seoul / KR | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2018/34] |
Former [2015/23] | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14193387.9 | 17.11.2014 | [2015/23] | Priority number, date | KR20130145327 | 27.11.2013 Original published format: KR 20130145327 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2879037 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2879037 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0414 (US);
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
G06F2203/04105 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2015/23] | English: | Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof | [2015/23] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle | [2015/23] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2014 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 17.11.2018 | LU | 17.11.2018 | MT | 17.11.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GB | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
MT | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
MT | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
MT | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 17.11.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 17.11.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1674977 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0078]; figure 10; claim 1 * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [XA]EP2214087 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0034]; claim - * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [XA]US2011084914 (ZALEWSKI GARY M [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] *[A] 2-8,10-15 |