EP2876611 - Method for secure transmission of an image of an electronic identity document to a terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMIA France 2 place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/01] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states IDEMIA France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Oberthur Technologies 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feraud, Alban c/o OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES, Département Propriété Intellectuelle 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Simon, Géraldine Marie Idemia France 2, Place Samuel de Champlain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/09] |
Former [2015/22] | Cougard, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14193705.2 | 18.11.2014 | [2015/22] | Priority number, date | FR20130061512 | 22.11.2013 Original published format: FR 1361512 | [2015/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876611 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2876611 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G07C9/253 (EP,US);
H04N1/32149 (US);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06T1/0021 (US);
H04N1/00209 (US);
H04N1/32352 (US);
G07C2209/41 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur gesicherten Übertragung eines Bildes eines elektronischen Identitätsdokuments an ein Endgerät | [2015/22] | English: | Method for secure transmission of an image of an electronic identity document to a terminal | [2015/22] | French: | Procédé de transmission sécurisée d'une image d'un document d'identité électronique vers un terminal | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7207480 (GEDDES MARTIN [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14-16,18 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 49 * * column 4, line 8 - line 49 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 59 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 5,13,17; | [A]US2008313082 (VAN BOSCH JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9-11,13-15,17,18 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0080] * * figure -; claim - *; | [X] - HYPPONEN K ET AL, "2008 The Institution of Engineering and Technology Pseudonymous mobile identity architecture based on government-supported PKI", vol. 4968, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-68979-9_8, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, (20080311), pages 107 - 118, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE/COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE > (EUROCRYPT )CHES 2008, SPRINGER, DE, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/t03x35363511433v/fulltext.pdf, (20090903), XP002544369 [X] 1-3,6-12,14,15,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-68979-9_8 | [A] - HYPPONEN K ET AL, "Combining biometric authentication with privacy-enhancing technologies", vol. 4968, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-68979-9_12, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, (20080311), pages 155 - 165, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE/COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE > (EUROCRYPT )CHES 2008, SPRINGER, DE, URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/kxl338570hxx8338/fulltext.pdf, (20090903), XP002544370 [A] 1,9-11,14,15,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-68979-9_12 | Examination | US2003136828 | EP1236181 | by applicant | - "2008 The Institution of Engineering and Technology Pseudonymous mobile identity architecture based on government-supported PKI", HYPPONEN K, lecture notes in computer science/computational science CHES, SPRINGER DE, (20080301), vol. 4968, pages 107 - 118 |